Global Patent Index - EP 0752152 B1

EP 0752152 B1 2000-05-31 - MULTI-AIR GAP MAGNETIC ACTUATOR

Title (en)

MULTI-AIR GAP MAGNETIC ACTUATOR

Title (de)

MAGNETISCHER BETÄTIGER MIT MEHRFACH LUFTSPALTEN

Title (fr)

ACTIONNEUR MAGNETIQUE A ENTREFERS MULTIPLES

Publication

EP 0752152 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95943267 A

Priority

  • FR 9501723 W
  • FR 9415694 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9620488A1] A magnetic actuator for adhering a moving piece (36) to a pole piece (38) separated therefrom by an air gap when an electrical circuit (34) is excited, at least one intermediate piece (42) being movably arranged in said air gap between the moving piece and the pole piece, and defining, in the absence of excitation (inoperative state), gaps (e1, e2) between the intermediate piece(s) and the moving piece and the pole piece respectively, these gaps being air gaps for the magnetic flux. Means (44, 64, 74) for limiting the travel of the intermediate piece (42) are provided for holding said intermediate piece in the inoperative position in which this piece (42), the pole piece (38) and the moving piece (36) are fixed and separated by said air gaps. Said means for limiting the travel of the intermediate piece preferably consist of a piece made of non-magnetic material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 7/13; H01F 7/14; H01F 7/16; H01H 50/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/13 (2006.01); H01F 7/14 (2006.01); H01F 7/16 (2006.01); H01H 50/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/14 (2013.01); H01F 7/13 (2013.01); H01F 7/1607 (2013.01); H01H 50/42 (2013.01); H01F 2007/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9620488 A1 19960704; DE 69517308 D1 20000706; DE 69517308 T2 20001130; EP 0752152 A1 19970108; EP 0752152 B1 20000531; FR 2728721 A1 19960628; FR 2728721 B1 19970314

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69517308

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-11-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SNECMA, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION (S.N.E.C.M.A.), PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69517308

- Effective date: 20121005

2012-11-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69517308

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

- Effective date: 20121005

2012-11-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69517308

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

- Effective date: 20121005

2012-10-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69517308

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

2012-06-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120517 AND 20120523

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

2000-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517308 20000706

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990217

1998-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MO

1997-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960718

1997-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT