Global Patent Index - EP 0752153 B2

EP 0752153 B2 2002-09-25 - ARC QUENCHING CHAMBER WITH THREE BARRIERS FOR THE PASSAGE OF ARC GASSES

Title (en)

ARC QUENCHING CHAMBER WITH THREE BARRIERS FOR THE PASSAGE OF ARC GASSES

Title (de)

LICHTBOGENLÖSCHKAMMER MIT DREI BARRIEREN FÜR DEN DURCHTRITT VON LICHTBOGENGASEN

Title (fr)

CHAMBRE D'EXTINCTION D'ARC A TROIS BARRIERES DE PASSAGE DES GAZ DE L'ARC

Publication

EP 0752153 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 95913022 A

Priority

  • DE 9500347 W
  • DE 4410108 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4410108A1] An arc quenching chamber (1) for a power switch has a shaft-shaped body (6) with quenching baffles (10) and an end body (7) that closes the top of the shaft-shaped body (6). The end body (7) contains three barriers (20, 22, 24) for arc gasses. The first and second barriers (20, 22) have strips (15, 21) with an approximately square cross-section mutually spaced apart by twice the distance between the extinguishing baffles (10). Above the second barrier is located a cooling chamber (25) that is outwardly closed by the third barrier (24) provided with outlets (26).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/342 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 4410108 A1 19950928; DE 4410108 C2 19960822; EP 0752153 A1 19970108; EP 0752153 B1 19980812; EP 0752153 B2 20020925; JP H09510574 A 19971021; US 5756951 A 19980526; WO 9526033 A1 19950928

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120310

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59503170

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100310

2011-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100910

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100310

2010-09-20 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100910

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090312

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-05-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090210

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-04-18 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2002-12-18 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2002-09-25 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

1999-06-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA

- Effective date: 19990511

1999-02-26 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 19981111

1998-11-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19981016

1998-11-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1998-09-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59503170 19980917

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

1998-03-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980122

1997-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960419

1997-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT