Global patent index - EP 0752217 B1

EP 0752217 B1 2001-01-03 - Sole for footwear

Title (en)

Sole for footwear

Title (de)

Sohle für Schuhwerk

Title (fr)

Semelle pour article chaussant

Publication

EP 0752217 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96500092 A

Priority

ES 9501822 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0752217A2] The sole is of the type that is comprised of a bottom part or sole (1) upon which the top part or front part of the sole (2) couples, the sole (1) having a low top perimetric extension (3) that begins from the edge thereof and whose contour (4) is irregular defining fanciful shapes. The front part of the sole (2) has in its side perimetric wall a shoulder (5) made in the bottom part of said perimetric side wall, whose contour (4) adapts exactly to the contour of the top perimetric extension (3) of the sole (1), all so that upon carrying out the assembly on the front part of the sole (2) on the sole (1), one adjusts perfectly with the other, in such a way that the perimetric side wall of both pieces remain perfectly aligned one being flush with the other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR IT LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0752217 A2 19970108; EP 0752217 A3 19980225; EP 0752217 B1 20010103; AR 002664 A1 19980325; AT 198409 T 20010115; BR 9601911 A 19980929; DE 69611401 D1 20010208; DE 69611401 T2 20010705; ES 1031565 U 19960116; ES 1031565 Y 19960616; TR 9600561 A2 19970221

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69611401

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-07-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-06-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-04-03 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010403

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69611401

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-08

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT LU NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-03 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 198409

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000204

2000-02-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SOLE FOR FOOTWEAR

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980818

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT LU NL PT SE

1997-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT LU NL PT SE