Global Patent Index - EP 0752223 B1

EP 0752223 B1 2000-04-26 - Coupling device for light-duty metal set of shelves

Title (en)

Coupling device for light-duty metal set of shelves

Title (de)

Verbindungsvorrichtung für Leichtbau-Metallregale

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'accouplement pour des étagères métalliques de construction légère

Publication

EP 0752223 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96110679 A

Priority

  • IT PD950059 U
  • IT PD960098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0752223A2] A coupling device for light-duty metal sets of shelves provided with uprights with which the shelves are associated directly, the device having a male component (14;103;203;314) that is formed directly on, or fixed to, a shelf (13;102;202;313) or an upright (12;101;201;312) and is constituted by a bracket (15;103;204;320) in which at least one portion is joined to the element from which it protrudes and has an inclined arrangement; the bracket has a transverse dimension that tapers along the direction for insertion in a corresponding and complementarily shaped female component (22;104;205;328) formed directly on the complementary component of the set of shelves or on an element that is fixed thereto. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 57/22; A47B 57/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/16 (2006.01); A47B 57/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/16 (2013.01); A47B 57/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0752223 A2 19970108; EP 0752223 A3 19970502; EP 0752223 B1 20000426; AT 192028 T 20000515; DE 69607893 D1 20000531; DE 69607893 T2 20001214; ES 2147331 T3 20000901

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160703

2016-10-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161026

2016-08-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 192028 T

- Effective date: 20160702

2016-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-07-06 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-07-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69607893

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150803

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-09-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20070322

2007-06-27 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20070322

2003-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: META-REGALBAU GMBH & CO.KG

2003-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KRB GMBH & CO. KG

2003-03-12 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: META-REGALBAU GMBH & CO.KG

- Effective date: 20001215

2003-03-12 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KRB GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20010124

2002-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: META-REGALBAU GMBH & CO.KG

2002-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KRB GMBH & CO. KG

2002-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: META-REGALBAU GMBH & CO.KG

2002-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KRB GMBH & CO. KG

2002-09-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: META-REGALBAU GMBH & CO.KG * 20010124 KRB GMBH & C

- Effective date: 20001215

2002-07-31 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: META-REGALBAU GMBH & CO.KG * 20010124 KRB GMBH & C

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: META-REGALBAU GMBH & CO.KG

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KRB GMBH & CO. KG

2001-03-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: META-REGALBAU GMBH & CO.KG

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-03-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KRB GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-02-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: META-REGALBAU GMBH & CO.KG

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-10-25 [K2C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT SPECIFICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147331 T3

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607893 20000531

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR LI NL

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192028 T 20000515

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981029

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970728

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR LI NL

1997-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR LI NL