Global Patent Index - EP 0752255 B1

EP 0752255 B1 2000-11-29 - Mobile fall arrest device for flexible safety rope

Title (en)

Mobile fall arrest device for flexible safety rope

Title (de)

Bewegliches Absturzsicherungsgerät für flexibles Rettungsseil

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'antichute mobile pour support d'assurage flexible

Publication

EP 0752255 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96410075 A

Priority

  • CA 2198027 A
  • FR 9508216 A
  • US 80505997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0752255A1] The grip has a vertical channel (9) through which the support cable passes slidably along a vertical axis (YY'). A cam (10) formed by a ramp surface of a pivotable lever (16) selectively engages the cable as it passes through the channel, moving between open and closed positions in response to manual actuation of the lever. The free end of the lever includes a hole (23) through which a carabineer or other clip may be passed and secured. When located in the hole, the projecting ends of the clip engage stop surfaces (20a,b) on the casing of the grip, preventing pivoting movement of the lever from a closed position of the cam to its open position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 35/04 (2006.01); A63B 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 1/14 (2013.01); A62B 35/04 (2013.01); A63B 29/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0752255 A1 19970108; EP 0752255 B1 20001129; EP 0752255 B2 20040630; AT 197769 T 20001215; CA 2198027 A1 19980819; DE 69611064 D1 20010104; DE 69611064 T2 20010719; DE 69611064 T3 20060511; ES 2153947 T3 20010316; ES 2153947 T5 20041201; FR 2736273 A1 19970110; US 5860493 A 19990119

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160628

2016-10-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161004

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160626

2016-07-20 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160626

2016-06-29 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160626

2016-06-27 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69611064

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150505

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150611

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-04-13 [REG DE 8570] REINSTATEMENT OF THE FORMER POSITION

2005-11-10 [REG DE 8570] REINSTATEMENT OF THE FORMER POSITION

2004-12-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2004-09-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-09-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2004-07-21 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2004-06-30 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2002-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SK S.A.R.L.

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-12-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DALLOZ FALL PROTECTION

2001-10-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DALLOZ FALL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20010806

2001-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-27 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010627

2001-03-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153947 T3

2001-02-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO S.P.A.

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611064 20010104

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-11-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197769 T 20001215

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990421

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970603

1997-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE