Global patent index - EP 0752310 B1

EP 0752310 B1 2000-03-22 - Feeding device for metal sheet printing and lacquering machines

Title (en)

Feeding device for metal sheet printing and lacquering machines

Title (de)

Anlegeeinrichtung für Blechtafeldruckmaschinen und Blechtafellackiermaschinen

Title (fr)

Margeur pour des imprimeuses et des machines de lacquage de tôles

Publication

EP 0752310 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95119014 A

Priority

DE 4445638 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4445638A1] The device has two stops (13) which are arranged in the path of motion of the front edge (12) of a metal sheet (11). The sheet can be linked by a coupler (22,23) to a device (14) which can move parallel to this path. The coupler is arranged above or below the sheet in the area of the stops, and can be guided across its path. It can also be guided at right angles to and from the sheet surface by a lifting device (24), and has an adhering element which makes a frictional connection with the sheet. The element may be a suction bowl or an electromagnet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 1/00; B65H 9/10; B65H 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 9/08 (2006.01); B65H 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 9/101 (2013.01); B65H 9/08 (2013.01); B65H 9/105 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 4445638 A1 19960627; EP 0752310 A2 19970108; EP 0752310 A3 19970910; EP 0752310 B1 20000322; EP 0752310 B2 20040107

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151201

2015-12-23 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20151201

2015-12-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59508065

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141231

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-12-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051202

2005-01-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-02-25 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2004-01-07 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-04-23 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: 7B 41F 1/00 A

2003-04-23 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: 7B 65H 9/10 B

2003-04-23 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: 7B 65H 9/08 B

2003-04-16 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: 7B 41F 1/00 A

2003-04-16 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: 7B 65H 9/10 B

2003-04-16 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: 7B 65H 9/08 B

2003-04-02 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: 7B 41F 1/00 A

2003-04-02 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: 7B 65H 9/10 B

2003-04-02 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: 7B 65H 9/08 B

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-22 [DX] MISCELLANEOUS: (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: DX

2001-03-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20001222

2001-03-14 [D26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D26N

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-06-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508065

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1999-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 6B 41F 1/00 A, 6B 65H 9/10 B, 6B 65H 9/08 B

1999-02-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981230

1998-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980306

1997-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1997-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT