Global Patent Index - EP 0752349 A3

EP 0752349 A3 2000-06-07 - Gas generator free of pyrotechnical means

Title (en)

Gas generator free of pyrotechnical means

Title (de)

Pyrotechnikfreier Gasgenerator

Title (fr)

Générateur de gaz exempt de moyens pyrotechniques

Publication

EP 0752349 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96109139 A

Priority

DE 19524094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0752349A2] The seal of the gas container is opened by means of electrical and/or magnetic energy or through a conversion of electrical and/or magnetic energy into kinetic energy and/or into thermal energy, all of which produce heating up of the gases. The energy is produced by a high voltage generator, a pulse generator or a plasma generator, or may be obtained from a condenser, coil, accumulator or battery. The heating up of the gases is achieved by a chemical reaction where the reacting gases with metal parts, combustible gases or fluids set in motion an oxidation process through heat generation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 21/26; F17C 3/06; F16K 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/268 (2011.01); B60R 21/272 (2006.01); F17C 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/268 (2013.01); B60R 21/272 (2013.01); F16K 13/04 (2013.01); F17C 13/06 (2013.01); F17C 2201/0109 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0617 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0311 (2013.01); F17C 2270/0168 (2013.01); Y10T 137/1647 (2015.04); Y10T 137/1692 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19524094 A1 19970102; EP 0752349 A2 19970108; EP 0752349 A3 20000607; EP 0752349 B1 20040324; ES 2220953 T3 20041216; JP H0911844 A 19970114; US 5857698 A 19990112

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111118

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050608

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050607

2006-02-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-06-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-06-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050607

2005-06-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050607

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-12-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2220953 T3

2004-07-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040617

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-03 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040603

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040602

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040505

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610947 P 20040429

2004-04-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60R 21/26 A

2004-03-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 17C 3/06 B

2004-03-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16K 31/00 B

2003-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRW AIRBAG SYSTEMS GMBH

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010323

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 60R 21/26 A, 7F 17C 3/06 B, 7F 16K 13/04 B

1998-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRW AIRBAG SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG

1997-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE