Global Patent Index - EP 0752467 B1

EP 0752467 B1 2001-04-11 - Storage stable composition based on peroxyacids

Title (en)

Storage stable composition based on peroxyacids

Title (de)

Lagerstabile Zusammensetzung auf Basis von Persäuren

Title (fr)

Composition stable au stockage à base de peroxyacides

Publication

EP 0752467 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95110262 A

Priority

EP 95110262 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0752467A1] A polyalkylene glycol (or one of its ethers) is used as the oxidn.-stable additive providing high foaming capability independent of water hardness in storage-stable, aq. antimicrobial compsns. contg. a 2-6C monocarboxylic acid, a 2-6C satd. aliphatic peracid, H2O2, a stabiliser for peroxy cpds. and anionic and non-ionic surfactants.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/37; C11D 3/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0094 (2013.01); C11D 3/2079 (2013.01); C11D 3/3707 (2013.01); C11D 3/3947 (2013.01); C11D 3/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0752467 A1 19970108; EP 0752467 B1 20010411; AT 200514 T 20010415; DE 59509184 D1 20010517; DK 0752467 T3 20010618

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090701

2010-03-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080723

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BACTRIA G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G. INDUSTRIEHYGIENE-SERV

- Effective date: 20010731

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-01 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010701

2001-06-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509184 20010517

2001-05-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL

2001-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200514 T 20010415

1999-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990514

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970707

1997-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL

1997-01-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT;LV;SI