Global Patent Index - EP 0752493 B1

EP 0752493 B1 2000-11-02 - Laundry washing machine having washing liquid filtering means

Title (en)

Laundry washing machine having washing liquid filtering means

Title (de)

Wäschewaschmaschine mit Vorrichtung zum Filtern der Waschlauge

Title (fr)

Machine à laver avec dispositif pour filtrer le liquide de lavage

Publication

EP 0752493 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96201862 A

Priority

IT TO950573 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0752493A1] A laundry washing machine is described, comprising a washing tub (2) which houses a basket (3), the tub (2) and the basket (3) both have respective openings facing an opening (11) being present in the cabinet of the machine (1), in said opening of the cabinet (11) a door (12) is provided, between the opening of the cabinet (11) and the opening of the tub a seal (10) is provided. According to the invention, in said seal (10), at a level being higher than that (7) reached by the liquid in the tub (2) during the wash, a seat (13) is provided in which a filtering element (14) of the washing liquid is housed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0752493 A1 19970108; EP 0752493 B1 20001102; DE 69610796 D1 20001207; DE 69610796 T2 20010301; ES 2152484 T3 20010201; IT 1276479 B1 19971031; IT TO950573 A1 19970107; IT TO950573 D0 19950706

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120703

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110720

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100704

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110712

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110728

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-08-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110818

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090707

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152484 T3

2001-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. DINI ROBERTO

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69610796 20001207

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981109

1997-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970628

1997-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT