Global patent index - EP 0752504 B1

EP 0752504 B1 2000-01-05 - Cavity wall tie and method for manufacturing the same

Title (en)

Cavity wall tie and method for manufacturing the same

Title (de)

Luftschichtanker für Mauerwerk und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Ancrage pour mur creux et méthode pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0752504 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96109307 A

Priority

DE 19524745 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0752504A1] The air gap tie anchor comprises a rod-shaped section (6) which is formed from a longitudinal section of the anchor tube (10) whose width (B) corresponds to the flat section (7) of the anchor. The flat section is formed in outline and/or in longitudinal section in the shape of a wave formation or a zigzag pattern. The zigzag pattern or wave depth (A) in outline is about 2-4 mm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/41

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/41 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/4178 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0752504 A1 19970108; EP 0752504 B1 20000105; DE 19524745 A1 19970109

INPADOC legal status

2003-04-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-04-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2003-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020611

2003-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GEBR. *BODEGRAVEN B.V.

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020611

2002-06-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020611

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010630

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-06-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010627

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-06-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010626

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-06-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010612

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-06-08 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20010608

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010530

- Year of fee payment: 06

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604087

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000210

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE NL

1997-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970429

1997-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970311

1997-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE NL