Global Patent Index - EP 0752572 B1

EP 0752572 B1 2000-07-12 - Warhead with hollow charge and munition having such a warhead

Title (en)

Warhead with hollow charge and munition having such a warhead

Title (de)

Gefechtskopf mit Hohlladung und mit einem solchem Gefechtskopf versehene Munition

Title (fr)

Tête militaire à charge formée et munition équipée d'une telle tête militaire

Publication

EP 0752572 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401342 A

Priority

FR 9508246 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0752572A1] The warhead (2) of the projectile (1) has a detonator (7) and an explosive charge (5) inside a casing (6) which is shaped to give a direction of action (3) which lies perpendicular to the axis (4) of the warhead. The casing, made from iron, copper, tantalum, nickel or a composite material, is made with one or more concave surfaces and can have a flat surface. In addn., the axis of the warhead casing lies more or less parallel to that of the projectile. The materials from which the casing is made can include, e.g. a plastic such as nylon, or glass.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/14; F42B 1/028

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 1/028 (2006.01); F42B 12/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/14 (2013.01); F42B 1/028 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0752572 A1 19970108; EP 0752572 B1 20000712; DE 69609252 D1 20000817; DE 69609252 T2 20010208; ES 2149436 T3 20001101; FR 2736424 A1 19970110; FR 2736424 B1 19970808; US 5801323 A 19980901

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100621

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100620

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100620

2011-02-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090703

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-07-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090625 AND 20090701

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-05-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040621

2004-06-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040621

2003-06-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030624

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149436 T3

2000-10-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. ETH H. R. WERFFELI PATENTANWALT

2000-10-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000911

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609252 20000817

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB LI SE

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981217

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970208

1997-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB LI SE