Global Patent Index - EP 0752691 B1

EP 0752691 B1 2002-09-11 - Driving assist method and vehicle equipped for carrying out this process

Title (en)

Driving assist method and vehicle equipped for carrying out this process

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Fahrhilfe und dazu ausgerüstetes Fahrzeug

Title (fr)

Procédé d'assistance à la conduite et véhicule équipé pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé

Publication

EP 0752691 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401476 A

Priority

FR 9508232 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0752691A1] A central control station receives weather, traffic conditions, accident and facilities information from a variety of sources and sends it to radio beacons (4) which are located along a road. Each vehicle (3) is equipped with an electronic card (13) linking it to the beacons. The electronic card (13) is connected to a calculator (7) which controls a memory card (8), a sensor of vehicle progress (9), a display screen (10) and detectors of fog ,ice and shocks. A radio telephone (12) is also provided. The sensor of vehicle progress (9) enables messages appropriate to a particular vehicle to be displayed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/0967; G08G 1/0968

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/0967 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/096716 (2013.01); G08G 1/09675 (2013.01); G08G 1/096775 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0752691 A1 19970108; EP 0752691 B1 20020911; DE 69623546 D1 20021017; DE 69623546 T2 20030320; ES 2186763 T3 20030516; FR 2736457 A1 19970110; FR 2736457 B1 19970814

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070704

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070705

2008-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070705

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070704

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070704

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060728

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186763 T3

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623546 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ET INDUSTRIELLE DES AUTOROUT

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991008

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970610

1997-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT