Global Patent Index - EP 0752732 B1

EP 0752732 B1 2001-05-30 - Microwave filter

Title (en)

Microwave filter

Title (de)

Mikrowellenfilter

Title (fr)

Filtre hyperfréquence

Publication

EP 0752732 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96106998 A

Priority

DE 19524263 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19524263C1] The microwave filter consists of a several rectangular wave guide resonators (R1-R4) organised on the same plane, and are coupled together by inductive elements (K11,K12,K23C,K34,K40). A coupling for the two main paths is provided by a bridging element (K14) between electrically non adjacent resonators (R1,R4). The phase value of the bridging element determines if the damping poles of the filter characteristic are above or below the transmission range.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/208

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/208 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/208 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19524263 C1 19961017; EP 0752732 A1 19970108; EP 0752732 B1 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-05-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-05-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040513

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040510

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040506

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020517

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-08-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606982 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001016

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970708

1997-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE