Global Patent Index - EP 0752739 B1

EP 0752739 B1 2000-10-25 - Connector with integrated pcb assembly

Title (en)

Connector with integrated pcb assembly

Title (de)

Verbinder mit integrierter Flachbaugruppe

Title (fr)

Connecteur avec assemblage intégré de circuit imprimé

Publication

EP 0752739 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95201811 A

Priority

EP 95201811 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0752739A1] A connector, preferably a right angle connector, comprising one or more integrated pcb assemblies (1), each of said pcb assemblies comprising an insulating substrate (16), a spacer (17) and a cover plate (18), each of said insulating substrates (16) comprising a predetermined pattern of conducting tracks (11) on a first surface, each of said conducting tracks (11) having one end for connection to one first contact terminal (4) for mating contact with a mating contact terminal of a mating connector, and another end for connection to one second contact terminal (7) wherein each of the spacers (17) are provided with a first set of one or more first openings (24) each arranged for accommodating at least part of one first contact terminal (4) and with a second set of one or more second openings (25) each arranged for accommodating at least part of one second contact terminal (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/648 (2006.01); H01R 12/50 (2011.01); H01R 13/518 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 23/688 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0752739 A1 19970108; EP 0752739 B1 20001025; CN 1244959 A 20000216; DE 69519226 D1 20001130; DE 69519226 T2 20010823; DE 69634005 D1 20050113; DE 69634005 T2 20051103; EP 0836756 A1 19980422; EP 0836756 A4 19990825; EP 0836756 B1 20041208; IN 190516 B 20030802; JP 2001525974 A 20011211; JP 2006108115 A 20060420; JP 3784836 B2 20060614; JP 4486028 B2 20100623; KR 100394531 B1 20030919; TW 369740 B 19990911; WO 9702627 A1 19970123

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69519226

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120704

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-03-05 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110718

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080703

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080703

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070706

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519226 20001130

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 12/16 A

1999-06-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CONNECTOR WITH INTEGRATED PCB ASSEMBLY

1998-07-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980529

1997-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970130

1997-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE