Global Patent Index - EP 0753038 B1

EP 0753038 B1 2000-10-04 - FRACTIONATION OF TRIGLYCERIDE OILS

Title (en)

FRACTIONATION OF TRIGLYCERIDE OILS

Title (de)

GLYCERID-ÖL FRAKTIONIERUNG

Title (fr)

FRACTIONNEMENT D'HUILES TRIGLYCERIDES

Publication

EP 0753038 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95913146 A

Priority

  • EP 95913146 A
  • EP 94200822 A
  • EP 9501038 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9526391A1] Dry fractionation of triglyceride oil using as an additive a crystallisation modifying substance comprising a monoglyceride or diglyceride of fatty acids, optionally esterified with citric acid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11B 3/00; C11B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11B 3/00 (2006.01); C11B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11B 7/0083 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9526391 A1 19951005; AU 2072195 A 19951017; AU 679850 B2 19970710; CA 2186767 A1 19951005; CA 2186767 C 20011016; DE 69519019 D1 20001109; DE 69519019 T2 20010517; DK 0753038 T3 20001030; EP 0753038 A1 19970115; EP 0753038 B1 20001004; ES 2151052 T3 20001216; ZA 9502576 B 19960930

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-01-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-12-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2002-12-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-11-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-10-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-04-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020402

2002-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-03-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-03-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010319

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010314

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010309

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010301

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-02-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-02-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-02-09 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20010209

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-02-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010208

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-01-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010104

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151052 T3

2000-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519019 20001109

2000-10-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB NL PT SE

1999-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981125

1997-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960902

1997-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB NL PT SE