Global Patent Index - EP 0753267 B1

EP 0753267 B1 2000-12-27 - Snowboard boot comprising an internal shell and a rigid articulated dorsal part

Title (en)

Snowboard boot comprising an internal shell and a rigid articulated dorsal part

Title (de)

Schneegleitbrett mit einer Innenschale und einem schwenkbaren steifen Hinterteil

Title (fr)

Botte de snowboard comprenant une coque interne et une partie dorsale rigide articulée

Publication

EP 0753267 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96107732 A

Priority

FR 9508587 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0753267A1] The boot has a sole (1) to which a relatively supple leg (2) is joined. A rigid shell (4) covers part of the sole and extends upwards, at the back, to cover the heel. A rigid back part (6) is articulated on the back of the shell (42) at the inner side of the boot. The axis of articulation of the back part (O) forms an angle of inclination of 20-45 deg with respect to the median longitudinal plane of the boot. The axis is inclined downwards from the back to the front and its angle is preferably near 30 deg.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04; A63C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/00 (2006.01); A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A63C 10/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/0482 (2013.01); A43B 5/0401 (2013.01); A63C 10/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0753267 A1 19970115; EP 0753267 B1 20001227; AT 198262 T 20010115; DE 69611327 D1 20010201; DE 69611327 T2 20010523; FR 2736514 A1 19970117; FR 2736514 B1 19970926; JP H0928402 A 19970204; US 6209229 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050515

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040515

2003-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030522

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030516

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030514

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DOTT. GIOVANNI LECCE & C.

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611327 20010201

2000-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2000-12-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198262 T 20010115

1999-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990408

1997-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970701

1997-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI