Global Patent Index - EP 0753349 B1

EP 0753349 B1 2000-08-02 - Inverted filter centrifuge

Title (en)

Inverted filter centrifuge

Title (de)

Stülpfilterzentrifuge

Title (fr)

Centrifugeuse à filtre retourné

Publication

EP 0753349 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96108210 A

Priority

DE 19525567 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0753349A2] The centrifugal filter is fed through a central opening in the lid by a non-rotating filling tube (18) which can be adjusted in an axial direction. A seal between filling tube and centrifuge drum is achieved by an assembly having a static seal ring (44) which bears against the centrifuge lid (10) and a dynamic (mechanical) seal which allows the outer portion of the assembly to rotate about the fixed inner portion, The mechanical seal consists of a rotating inner ring (35, 39) which is forced by springs (36, 40) against the static outer ring (34, 38). These seals surround a sealing chamber (41) which is supplied through a pipe (42) with a sealant which is returned through the space (31) between the inner tube and the outer casing of the filling tube (18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04B 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 3/02 (2006.01); B04B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 3/025 (2013.01); B04B 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0753349 A2 19970115; EP 0753349 A3 19970502; EP 0753349 B1 20000802; DE 19525567 A1 19970116; US 5630938 A 19970520

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090523

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080724

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080524

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070523

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070523

2006-05-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-04-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MANNESMANN DEMAG KRAUSS-MAFFEI AG TRANSFER- KRAUSS

2002-04-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-03-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-12-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-09-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605672 20000907

2000-09-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IE IT LI

1999-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANNESMANN DEMAG KRAUSS-MAFFEI AG

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990816

1997-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970325

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IE IT LI

1997-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IE IT LI