Global Patent Index - EP 0753396 B1

EP 0753396 B1 2001-12-19 - Device suitable to be used with a pressing apparatus

Title (en)

Device suitable to be used with a pressing apparatus

Title (de)

Vorrichtung geeignet zur Anwendung in einem Pressgerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif utilisable dans un appareil de pressage

Publication

EP 0753396 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96111231 A

Priority

IT MI951519 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0753396A2] The present invention relates to a device that is suitable to be used with a pressing apparatus, which includes: a bed plate (10) for withstanding a pressing force that is discharged onto a lower mold (11); a strike plate (16) that is arranged above the bed plate (10), in order to support a lower plunger (13) of the lower mold (11); pusher pistons (18) for lifting the strike plate (16). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 15/06; B30B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/02 (2006.01); B30B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/026 (2013.01); B30B 11/02 (2013.01); B30B 15/028 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0753397 A2 19970115; EP 0753397 A3 19971029; EP 0753397 B1 20020925; DE 69618094 D1 20020131; DE 69618094 T2 20020814; DE 69623878 D1 20021031; DE 69623878 T2 20030731; EP 0753396 A2 19970115; EP 0753396 A3 19971029; EP 0753396 B1 20011219; EP 0753396 B2 20060301; ES 2164810 T3 20020301; ES 2164810 T5 20061016; ES 2183897 T3 20030401; IT 1275537 B 19970807; IT MI951519 A1 19970114; IT MI951519 D0 19950714

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110713

2013-04-17 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130417

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110712

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100408

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-10-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2006-03-01 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2003-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030729

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SACMI - COOPERATIVA MECCANICI IMOLA SOC. COOP. A.R

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2164810 T3

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69618094 20020131

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000117

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971206

1997-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1997-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT