Global Patent Index - EP 0753475 B1

EP 0753475 B1 2001-12-19 - Feeding device for flat materials

Title (en)

Feeding device for flat materials

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Zuführen von flachen Materialien

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'introduction de matériaux plats

Publication

EP 0753475 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96104381 A

Priority

CH 200095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0753475A2] The device feeding flat sheets (14) into a machine has a magazine (6), with a bottom (8) and a front wall (9), in which a pile of sheets is placed. Driving parts (20) on a drive shaft displace a sheet from the pile and lead it into a machine. There are parts (48) for retaining the sheets in the pile under the raised sheet. The retaining part is constituted by a small fibre velour strips arranged on the front wall of the magazine. These fibres have a resistance to displacement adapted to retain the sheets by their front edge and allow the raised sheet to be driven by the driving parts. The front wall of the magazine has a plane (45) inclined to the normal at the bottom. The fibre strips are fixed in hollows (47) in the inclined plane. The depth of these hollows is less than the fibre length so that they pass beyond the upper surface of the inclined plane and engage with the front edge of the sheets.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/56; B65H 1/04; B65H 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/04 (2006.01); B65H 3/06 (2006.01); B65H 3/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/0638 (2013.01); B65H 1/022 (2013.01); B65H 3/0653 (2013.01); B65H 3/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0753475 A2 19970115; EP 0753475 A3 19980114; EP 0753475 B1 20011219; CH 690853 A5 20010215; DE 69618095 D1 20020131; DE 69618095 T2 20020711; US 5711519 A 19980127

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150320

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150320

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150320

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69618095

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140317

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69618095 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-07-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: OLIVETTI TECNOST S.P.A.

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: OLIVETTI LEXIKON S.P.A.

2000-03-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000124

1998-06-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980428

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT