Global Patent Index - EP 0753608 B1

EP 0753608 B1 2001-05-09 - Spun yarn of polybenzazole fiber

Title (en)

Spun yarn of polybenzazole fiber

Title (de)

Gesponnenes Garn aus Polybenzazolfasern

Title (fr)

Filé de fibres de polybenzazole

Publication

EP 0753608 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96110738 A

Priority

JP 16860595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0753608A2] There is provided a spun yarn of a polybenzazole fiber having a single fiber fineness of 1 to 3 deniers and an average fiber length of 30 to 200 mm, the spun yarn having a tenacity of 15 g/d or higher and satisfying the following relationship: <MATH> where K is the twist constant expressed by T/(Ne)<1/2> and L is the average fiber length in millimeter, and where T is the number of twist per inch and Ne is the British cotton count of the spun yarn. The spun yarn can be used for various purposes because it has high tenacity, high heat resistance, high flame retardance, good feeling, and good appearance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 3/02; D01F 6/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/66 (2006.01); D01F 6/74 (2006.01); D02G 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/74 (2013.01); Y10T 428/29 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2904 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2913 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2967 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0753608 A2 19970115; EP 0753608 A3 19970820; EP 0753608 B1 20010509; DE 69612703 D1 20010613; DE 69612703 T2 20020131; JP 3468323 B2 20031117; JP H0921025 A 19970121; US 5624752 A 19970429

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080711

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612703 20010613

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000615

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980203

1997-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1997-08-20 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D02G 3/02

1997-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR