Global Patent Index - EP 0753612 B1

EP 0753612 B1 2000-02-02 - Manual suction apparatus for the machine cleaning

Title (en)

Manual suction apparatus for the machine cleaning

Title (de)

Manuelle Absaugvorrichtung zur Maschinenreinigung

Title (fr)

Appareil d'aspiration manuel pour le nettoyage de machines

Publication

EP 0753612 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96108035 A

Priority

  • DE 29511437 U
  • DE 19528064 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0753612A1] A textile machine has a suction plant (1a, 1b) connected to stationary suction equipment (3) to remove fibres, particles and/or trash from the working section (A). A second flexible tubular suction duct (4) is connected at its fixed end to the suction plant (1a, 1b). Its free end (6) can be freely moved round the working area (A) to draw fly and trash into the suction plant. Also claimed is a method of using the above appts. Pref. the flexible hose (4) is connected to the filter housing (1) of a drawframe suction system which can have its own fan (11) or be operated from a central suction plant (14). Removal of the nozzle (6) from its holder (5) for manual cleaning of a stationary machine activates a switch to close off the suction to the stationary equipment (3) with a flap (10) so that the full capacity of the suction system is available to the hand nozzle (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 11/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0753612 A1 19970115; EP 0753612 B1 20000202; US 5720075 A 19980224

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050521

2002-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-08-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-06-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20000605

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000515

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-03-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604347 20000309

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-02-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981117

1997-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960521

1997-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI