Global Patent Index - EP 0753613 B1

EP 0753613 B1 2000-06-21 - Device for continuously inserting a core in a sliver

Title (en)

Device for continuously inserting a core in a sliver

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum fortlaufenden Einbringen eines Kernfadens in ein Faserband

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'insertion en continu d'un fil d'ame dans une mèche de fibres

Publication

EP 0753613 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96440055 A

Priority

FR 9508585 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0753613A1] An appts. to deliver a continuous stretch core (3) to a cladding fibre (2) feed, in the prodn. of core spun yarns, has a deflection roller (9) for the core (3) at a gap (D) from the feed roller (6) of at least 250 mm, with free core travel along this stretch (D) to take up vibrations through the passage of the fibres (2) acting on the feed roller (6). A drawing stage for the core yarn (3) has a leading section (24) defined by the support shaft (20) and the deflection roller (9). A second drawing stage is defined by the deflection roller (9) and the feed roller (6). The total stretch coefficient of the successive stages (24,25) is set through a higher stretch in the first stage (24) than in the second (25) so that, at the feed roller (6), the core has a very low differential tension. Pref. the stretch coefficient at the first drawing stage (24) is 80-98% and pref. 95% and, at the second stage (25) is 2-20% and pref. 5%. The support shaft (20), deflection roller (9) and feed roller (6) have independent motor drives (21-23), with power supplied through electronic variable speed units. A central unit (26) is programmable to control the motors (21-23). The deflection roller (9) has a V-shaped circular groove, with a groove base in an arc segment at a radius set according to the core yarn (3) dia..

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 3/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/324 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0753613 A1 19970115; EP 0753613 B1 20000621; DE 69608929 D1 20000727; FR 2736658 A1 19970117; FR 2736658 B1 19970905

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2005-10-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050728

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: JEAN-FRANCOIS FERDINAND

- Free text: SOCIETE NOUVELLE D'APPLICATIONS MECANIQUES ET OPTIQUES SNAMO SA#14, RUE DU BALLON#93160 NOISY LE GRAND (FR) -TRANSFER TO- JEAN-FRANCOIS FERDINAND#37, RUE D'ILLFURTH#SPECHBACH-LE-BAS (FR)

2003-07-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOC. NOUVELLE D'APPLICATIONS MECANIQUES ET OPTIQUE

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-12-20 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-10-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDU

2000-09-22 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-09-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608929 20000727

2000-07-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI PT

2000-06-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-06-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-06-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000621

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990702

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970707

1997-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI PT