Global patent index - EP 0753619 B1

EP 0753619 B1 2001-01-31 - Device for passing a treating fluid through a textile material or the like

Title (en)

Device for passing a treating fluid through a textile material or the like

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum durchströmenden Behandeln von Textilgut od. dgl.

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour faire passer un fluide de traitement à travers une matière textile ou analogue

Publication

EP 0753619 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95117764 A

Priority

DE 19525459 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0753619A2] A drum for flow treating textiles, non-wovens or paper, forwards the material as a roller while under internal suction. The drum periphery (5) is perforated and is covered with a sieve (9) which is spaced from the drum by sheet metal strips (10) extending between the end walls. The radially inner edges of the metal strips (10,10') are rigidly attached to the drum periphery (5) through a flange (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 23/02; F26B 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 5/00 (2006.01); B01J 19/00 (2006.01); D06B 23/02 (2006.01); D21F 5/18 (2006.01); F26B 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/184 (2013.01); D06B 23/025 (2013.01); F26B 13/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0753619 A2 19970115; EP 0753619 A3 19980107; EP 0753619 B1 20010131; AU 5944296 A 19970123; AU 706688 B2 19990624; BR 9603073 A 19980505; JP 3939385 B2 20070704; JP H0931827 A 19970204

INPADOC legal status

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101111

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59509005

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110801

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091203

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091202

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-05-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59509005

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-08

2001-02-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2001-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991220

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971117

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

1997-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI