Global Patent Index - EP 0753636 B1

EP 0753636 B1 2000-10-25 - Window stay with anti-burglar device

Title (en)

Window stay with anti-burglar device

Title (de)

Fensteraussteller mit Einbruchssicherung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'arrêt de fenêtres avec dispositif antivol

Publication

EP 0753636 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96202009 A

Priority

  • NL 1000795 A
  • NL 1002829 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0753636A1] One end of the assembly is attached to the stationary frame by a screw plate (6), which has a snap on cover (5). The other end is similarly attached (7,8) to the frame of the hinged window. The fixing plates are linked by two arms (2,3) by hinged swivel devices (17,18). At the junction between the arms (12) is an operating handle. The assembly limits the amount by which the window can be opened. When the window is closed, a bayonet fitting on the window swivel locks into a socket (19) on the frame swivel and acts as an impedance to burglars.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

NL 1002829 C1 19960911; DE 59606035 D1 20001130; EP 0753636 A1 19970115; EP 0753636 B1 20001025

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150201

2015-02-25 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150201

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-03-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030715

2004-03-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-07-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-07-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030715

2002-07-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020723

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020624

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: AGENTUREN KRUYDER AMERSFOORT B.V.

- Effective date: 20010731

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. CHARMAG

- Effective date: 20010731

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-03-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-01-25 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-12-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606035 20001130

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK GB NL SE

1999-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981201

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970428

1997-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK GB NL SE