Global Patent Index - EP 0753637 B1

EP 0753637 B1 2000-04-05 - Structure for the assembly of sliding doors

Title (en)

Structure for the assembly of sliding doors

Title (de)

Struktur zum Anordnen von Schiebetüren

Title (fr)

Structure pour l'assemblage des portes coulissantes

Publication

EP 0753637 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95500147 A

Priority

ES 9501409 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0753637A1] Structure for the assembly of sliding doors, made up of at least an upper tubular track (1) along which may slide rollers (2) from which doors (4) are suspended. The track has on its upper wall an internal longitudinal channel forming (12) in which the heads of the fixing screws are housed, whereas it is externally fitted with wings (15) that define, together with the outside of the channel forming (12), the track (1) resting base. The rollers (2) incorporate a frame made from an U shaped profile. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/06 (2006.01); E05F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/0626 (2013.01); E05D 15/0656 (2013.01); E05F 5/003 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/684 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/45 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/46 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0753637 A1 19970115; EP 0753637 B1 20000405; AT 191534 T 20000415; DE 69516131 D1 20000511; DE 69516131 T2 20001221; DK 0753637 T3 20000814; ES 2135990 A1 19991101; ES 2135990 B1 20000501; ES 2164498 A1 20020216; ES 2164498 B1 20030316; GR 3033910 T3 20001130; PT 753637 E 20000929

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151109

2016-02-24 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Document: GR 20000401595

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-01-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151030

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151029

2015-12-15 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-12-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 191534 T

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-12-02 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2015-11-18 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20151029

2015-11-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-11-09 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: MAXIMUM VALIDITY LIMIT REACHED

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-11-04 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20151029

2015-11-02 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-10-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69516131

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141230

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141029

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20141010

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141031

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20141023

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20141023

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20141023

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-08-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A.

2000-05-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516131 20000511

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19951104;LV PAYMENT 19951104;SI PAYMENT 19951104

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191534 T 20000415

1998-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981022

1997-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970228

1997-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 951104;LV PAYMENT 951104;SI PAYMENT 951104