Global Patent Index - EP 0753706 B1

EP 0753706 B1 2000-11-22 - Smoke exhaust system, in particular exhaust hood

Title (en)

Smoke exhaust system, in particular exhaust hood

Title (de)

Rauchabzugvorrichtung, insbesondere Abzugshaube

Title (fr)

Système d'aspiration d'émanations, notamment pour hotte aspirante

Publication

EP 0753706 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401503 A

Priority

FR 9508505 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0753706A1] The fume extraction system generates a continuous air curtain (F) along a truncated surface surrounding the extraction zone. The air is rotated and diverges as it descends along the surface. The induced fumes rise along a vortex column (F') located in the middle of the zone. The system comprise an upper dome (1) whose top (10) is located on the column axis (XX'). A lower dome (2), with the same axis, has its top displaced along the axis relative to the upper dome and has an opening (20) centred on the axis. A ventilation system (4) is placed on the axis between the tops of the upper and lower domes. The ventilation system comprises turbines for generating radial air in the air guide (3), delimited by the domes, and axial air induction in the zone through the opening. The upper and lower domes are directed downwards and widened so that the air speed vector leaving the guide has a vertical component and two horizontal components. There is a fume filtering system (5,6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/2028 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0753706 A1 19970115; EP 0753706 B1 20001122; AT 197731 T 20001215; DE 69611008 D1 20001228; DE 69611008 T2 20010517; FR 2736567 A1 19970117; FR 2736567 B1 19970808

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120801

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20110826

2007-04-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-07-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050709

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2002-08-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020806

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BRANDT COOKING

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-11-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-02-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-02-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611008 20001228

2000-12-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR IT NL SE

2000-11-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-11-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-11-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197731 T 20001215

2000-07-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRANDT COOKING

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981113

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970530

1997-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR IT NL SE