Global Patent Index - EP 0753715 B1

EP 0753715 B1 2001-01-10 - Heat exchanger

Title (en)

Heat exchanger

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 0753715 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96109853 A

Priority

DE 19525216 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19525216C1] Heat exchanger (10) heats, cooks or boils a confection, pref. a solution containing a sugar or sugar substitutes. Ends of the casing (11) are closed by head plates (13, 14). Inlets (26, 27, 28) and outlets (31, 32, 33) are provided for thermal medium. In the internal volume (16), parallel, rectangular flow channel sections (35) carry the prod., their ends sealed into the head plates. In the new design, separators (19, 20) divide the internal volume into compartments (21, 22, 23). The length of the prod. flow-path in the heat exchanger is determined by the construction of the interchangeable head plates (13, 14). Channel sections (35) with product inlets (39), have smaller height (h) and cross sectional area than channel sections (35) with product outlets (41).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 27/02; F28D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C13B 25/00 (2011.01); F28D 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C13B 25/001 (2013.01); F28D 9/00 (2013.01); F28F 27/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19525216 C1 19961121; EP 0753715 A2 19970115; EP 0753715 A3 19971203; EP 0753715 B1 20010110; JP H0979771 A 19970328

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050619

2005-02-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040619

2004-06-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040619

2004-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-05-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030528

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020802

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-04-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010320

2001-03-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606290

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-15

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000301

1998-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980603

1997-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

1997-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL