Global Patent Index - EP 0753797 B1

EP 0753797 B1 2001-02-28 - Imaging method with intermediate transfer member

Title (en)

Imaging method with intermediate transfer member

Title (de)

Bilderzeugungsmethode mit Zwischenübertragungselement

Title (fr)

Methode de formation d'images à élément de transfert intermédiaire

Publication

EP 0753797 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96202488 A

Priority

  • EP 96202488 A
  • EP 94200966 A
  • EP 91901324 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0753797A2] Imaging apparatus for printing images on two sides of a substrate (42) from latent images formed on a latent image bearing surface (16) including: developing apparatus (22) for developing the latent image with a liquid developer to form a developed liquid toner image; a first intermediate transfer member (40), first transfer apparatus for transferring the developed image from the latent image bearing surface (16) to the first intermediate transfer member (40) at a first transfer region; a second intermediate transfer member (47> second transfer means for transferring the developed image from the first image transfer member (40) to the second intermediate transfer member (47) at a second transfer region; and third transfer apparatus for simultaneously transferring a developed image from the first intermediate transfer member and a developed image image from the second intermediate transfer member to the two sides of a substrate (42).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/00; G03G 13/23; G03G 15/23

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/231 (2013.01); G03G 2215/0174 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0753797 A2 19970115; EP 0753797 A3 19970507; EP 0753797 B1 20010228

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081213

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071213

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071213

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-01-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69033709 20010405

2001-03-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-02-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 515378

2001-02-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 609966

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 03G 15/00 A, 7G 03G 15/23 B, 7G 03G 13/23 B

2000-05-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: IMAGING METHOD WITH INTERMEDIATE TRANSFER MEMBER

1999-11-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: IMAGING METHOD WITH INTERMEDIATE TRANSFER MEMBER

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990311

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970825

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIOR,ISHAIAU

1997-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LANDA,BENZION

1997-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAVON,AMIRAN

1997-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PINHAS,HANNA

1997-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIOR,ISHAIAU

1997-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LANDA,BENZION

1997-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAVON,AMIRAN

1997-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PINHAS,HANNA

1997-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIOR,ISHAIAU

1997-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LANDA,BENZION

1997-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAVON,AMIRAN

1997-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PINHAS,HANNA

1997-01-15 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 609966

1997-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT