Global Patent Index - EP 0754092 B1

EP 0754092 B1 2000-07-05 - DRUM MILL

Title (en)

DRUM MILL

Title (de)

ROHRMÜHLE

Title (fr)

BROYEUR A TAMBOUR

Publication

EP 0754092 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95915363 A

Priority

  • SE 9500356 W
  • SE 9401128 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9526822A1] The invention relates to a method and an arrangement pertaining to rotary grinding mills (1) of the kind which include a rotatably mounted drum (3) having a first end-wall (5) and a second end-wall (6), a material infeed arrangement (30) and a drum rotating means (60). The material to be ground is introduced into the mill with the aid of an infeed device (31) which delivers material to the drum (3) in a region located between the drum rotating means (60) and the first end-wall (5) of the drum. Ground material is discharged from the mill (1) through a material outfed device (70) mounted adjacent the second end-wall (6) of the drum. The infeed device (31) may have the form of a vane impeller which is adapted to introduce the material into the drum (3) through the medium of mutually communicating openings (37, 12, 10) and through the medium of the first end-wall (5) of the drum. The drum rotating means (60) is suitably a hydraulic motor mounted adjacent the material infeed arragement (30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 17/18 (2006.01); B02C 17/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 17/24 (2013.01); B02C 17/183 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FR GB GR IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9526822 A1 19951012; AT 194301 T 20000715; AU 2226295 A 19951023; AU 703113 B2 19990318; BR 9507269 A 19970923; CA 2187235 A1 19951012; DE 69517803 D1 20000810; EP 0754092 A1 19970122; EP 0754092 B1 20000705; SE 504383 C2 19970127; SE 9401128 D0 19940405; SE 9401128 L 19951006

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-12-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-10-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-10-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-10-06 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-10-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-10-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517803 20000810

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB GR IT PT SE

2000-07-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194301 T 20000715

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990713

1997-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961105

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB GR IT PT SE