Global Patent Index - EP 0754146 B1

EP 0754146 B1 2001-12-12 - PLASTICS CONTAINER MADE BY MATERIAL PERMEABLE TO GAS

Title (en)

PLASTICS CONTAINER MADE BY MATERIAL PERMEABLE TO GAS

Title (de)

KUNSTSTOFFBEHÄLTER AUS GASDURCHLÄSSIGEN MATERIAL

Title (fr)

RECIPIENT PLASTIQUE FAIT PAR UN MATERIAU PERMEABLE AU GAS

Publication

EP 0754146 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95937038 A

Priority

  • DE 19502449 A
  • EP 9504263 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19502449A1] The invention concerns a plastics container (1) which is made of monomer material (6) and comprises a fluid-tight closure (2) and a degassing device (3) for liquid contents capable of degassing. As a degassing device (3), the container (1) is provided at least partially in the casing area (4) with a container wall thickness (5) and consists of a gas-permeable material (6) such that the container (1) has a gas-permeability capacity per unit of time which is equal to or greater than the gas volume occurring as a result of the degassing of the contents per unit of time.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/00 (2006.01); B65D 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/0207 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19502449 A1 19960801; BR 9507204 A 19970902; EP 0754146 A1 19970122; EP 0754146 B1 20011212; ES 2168391 T3 20020616; JP 2767498 B2 19980618; JP H09502151 A 19970304; WO 9622917 A1 19960801

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071030

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061030

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061030

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051006

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050926

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031112

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168391 T3

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509942 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PLASTICS CONTAINER MADE BY MATERIAL PERMEABLE TO GAS

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990618

1997-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960613

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT