Global Patent Index - EP 0754225 A4

EP 0754225 A4 2001-01-31 - TRANSGENIC NON-HUMAN ANIMALS CAPABLE OF PRODUCING HETEROLOGOUS ANTIBODIES

Title (en)

TRANSGENIC NON-HUMAN ANIMALS CAPABLE OF PRODUCING HETEROLOGOUS ANTIBODIES

Title (de)

HETEROLOGE ANTIKÖRPER PRODUZIERENDE TRANSGENE NICHT-HUMANE TIERE

Title (fr)

ANIMAUX TRANSGENIQUES CAPABLES DE PRODUIRE DES ANTICORPS HETEROLOGUES

Publication

EP 0754225 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 94916581 A

Priority

  • US 9404580 W
  • US 5313193 A
  • US 9676293 A
  • US 15530193 A
  • US 16173993 A
  • US 16569993 A
  • US 20974194 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9425585A1] The invention relates to transgenic non-human animals capable of producing heterologous antibodies and methods for producing human sequence antibodies which bind to human antigens with substantial affinity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/13; A01K 67/027; A61K 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); C07K 16/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C07K 16/30 (2006.01); C07K 16/42 (2006.01); C07K 16/44 (2006.01); C07K 16/46 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/02 (2006.01); C12N 15/85 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/8509 (2013.01); A01K 67/0278 (2013.01); C07K 16/00 (2013.01); C07K 16/2812 (2013.01); C07K 16/3007 (2013.01); C07K 16/4291 (2013.01); C07K 16/44 (2013.01); C07K 16/462 (2013.01); A01K 2207/15 (2013.01); A01K 2217/00 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A01K 2217/30 (2013.01); A01K 2227/105 (2013.01); A01K 2267/01 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C07K 2317/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DX] WO 9203918 A1 19920319 - GENPHARM INT [US]
  • [A] WO 9004036 A1 19900419 - MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al
  • [PX] WO 9312227 A1 19930624 - GENPHARM INT [US]
  • [X] LONBERG NILS ET AL: "A transgenic mouse that expresses a diversity of human sequence heavy and light chain immunoglobulins.", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY SUPPLEMENT, no. 17 PART B, 1993, Keystone Symposium on Molecular Aspects of B Lymphocyte Differentiation;Taos, New Mexico, USA; February 1-8, 1993, pages 204, XP000944314, ISSN: 0733-1959
  • [X] TUAILLON NADINE ET AL: "Human immunoglobulin heavy-chain minilocus recombination in transgenic mice: Gene-segment use in mu and gamma transcripts.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, vol. 90, no. 8, 1993, 1993, pages 3720 - 3724, XP000941639, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • [X] TAYLOR L D ET AL: "A TRANSGENIC MOUSE THAT EXPRESSES A DIVERSITY OF HUMAN SEQUENCE HEAVY AND LIGHT CHAIN IMMUNOGLOBINS", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH,GB,OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, vol. 20, no. 23, 11 December 1992 (1992-12-11), pages 6287 - 6295, XP002041128, ISSN: 0305-1048
  • [A] DURDIK ET AL: "Isotype switching by a microinjected mu immunoglobulin heavy chain gene in transgenic mice", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON,US, vol. 86, April 1989 (1989-04-01), pages 2346 - 2350, XP002100492, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • [A] KITAMURA ET AL: "A B cell-deficient mouse by targeted disruption of the membrane exon of the immununoglobulin chain gene", NATURE,GB,MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, vol. 350, 4 April 1991 (1991-04-04), pages 423 - 426, XP002065596, ISSN: 0028-0836
  • [PX] LONBERG NILS ET AL: "Human sequence antibodies from transgenic mice.", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY SUPPLEMENT, no. 18D, 1994, Keystone Symposium on Antibody Engineering: Research and Application of Genes Encoding Immunoglobulins;Lake Tahoe, California, USA; March 7-13, 1994, pages 185, XP000944312, ISSN: 0733-1959
  • [PX] TAYLOR LISA D ET AL: "Human immunoglobulin transgenes undergo rearrangement, somatic mutation and class switching in mice that lack endogenous IgM.", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 6, no. 4, April 1994 (1994-04-01), pages 579 - 591, XP000944310, ISSN: 0953-8178
  • [T] LONBERG NILS ET AL: "Antigen-specific human antibodies from mice comprising four distinct genetic modifications.", NATURE (LONDON), vol. 368, no. 6474, 28 April 1994 (1994-04-28), pages 856 - 859, XP000941636, ISSN: 0028-0836
  • See also references of WO 9425585A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9425585 A1 19941110; AU 6819494 A 19941121; CA 2161351 A1 19941110; CA 2161351 C 20101221; EP 0754225 A1 19970122; EP 0754225 A4 20010131; JP 2007054076 A 20070308; JP 2012143252 A 20120802; JP 5099405 B2 20121219; JP 5550026 B2 20140716; JP H08509612 A 19961015

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040609

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020919

2001-01-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001218

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB LI

2001-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 15/13 A, 7A 01K 67/027 B, 7A 61K 39/00 B

1997-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951127

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB LI