Global Patent Index - EP 0754247 B1

EP 0754247 B1 2000-08-09 - METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR THE HEAT TREATMENT OF MATERIALS

Title (en)

METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR THE HEAT TREATMENT OF MATERIALS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM WÄRMEBEHANDELN EINES BEHANDLUNGSGUTES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE DE MATERIAUX

Publication

EP 0754247 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95913086 A

Priority

  • DE 4411505 A
  • DE 4431939 A
  • EP 9500906 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9527802A1] The installation proposed includes a conveyor belt (7) on which a bulk sinter mixture is deposited by a device (9). The conveyor belt carries the sinter mixture through a sintering plant (1) at the entry to which is disposed an ignition oven (3). The oven ignites the upper surface of the sinter bed. An extractor (11) located below the sinter bed sucks the burning zone down into the sinter bed. Located below the sinter bed at the output end of the sintering plant (1) is a second ignition oven (4) which ignites the lower surface of the sinter bed. A second extractor (6) sucks the second burning zone upwards. The pollutant content of the exhaust gases is significantly reduced since, in the input zone, the uninserted material acts as a filter while, in the output zone, combustion of the pollutants produced takes place in the upper-surface combustion zone. An additional adsorption agent ensures that the pollutants emerge mainly in the output zone of the sintering plant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22B 1/20; F27B 21/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22B 1/20 (2006.01); F27B 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27B 21/06 (2013.01); C22B 1/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9527802 A1 19951019; CA 2184843 A1 19951019; EP 0754247 A1 19970122; EP 0754247 B1 20000809

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2006-02-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-03-11 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020311

2001-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: STEAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-02-23 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20010223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-02-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000809

2001-01-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-11-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-10-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: STEAG ENCOTEC GMBH

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508629 20000914

2000-08-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: STEAG ENCOTEC GMBH

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB LU NL SE

2000-08-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-09 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000809

1997-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970717

1997-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960426

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB LU NL SE