Global Patent Index - EP 0754511 B1

EP 0754511 B1 2001-12-12 - Method for rolling profiles in a workpiece

Title (en)

Method for rolling profiles in a workpiece

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Walzen von Profilen in ein Werkstück

Title (fr)

Procédé pour laminer des profilés dans une pièce

Publication

EP 0754511 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95111557 A

Priority

DE 19526071 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0754511A2] The process uses rolling tools and a drive unit with drive engine. The drive unit is braked or accelerated, pref. close to the tool, to compensate for tolerance in the drive unit. The unit is braked, when the tool engages in the workpiece, and the brake force is lifted shortly after rolling is finished. Braking is hydro-dynamic, and pref. computer-controlled. The braking momentum is smaller than the drive momentum, thereby maintaining constant the drive speed of the drive unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21H 3/04; B21H 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21H 3/04 (2006.01); B21H 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21H 3/04 (2013.01); B21H 5/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0754511 A2 19970122; EP 0754511 A3 19970129; EP 0754511 B1 20011212; DE 19526071 A1 19970123; ES 2167387 T3 20020516

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59509943

2015-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59509943

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT DR. WEISS, ARA, DE

2015-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59509943

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT WEISS, ARAT & , DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120723

2013-12-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131218

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167387 T3

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509943 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-12-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-08-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000201

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970707

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI