Global patent index - EP 0754603 B1

EP 0754603 B1 2000-03-15 - Air bag inflator module for snap-on attachment to a steering wheel

Title (en)

Air bag inflator module for snap-on attachment to a steering wheel

Title (de)

Luftsack-Aufblasmodul zur Schnappbefestigung an einem Lenkrad

Title (fr)

Module de gonflage de coussin d'air à fixation par clipsage sur un volant de direction

Publication

EP 0754603 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96305102 A

Priority

US 50579395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0754603A1] An air bag module base (14) is connected to a support (26) on a steering wheel by means of at least one snap-engaged fastener (32). Each fastener (32) includes a bolt (40) with a threaded shank (40b) and a threaded sleeve (38) engaged therewith and permanently secured to the base (14) by a deformed flange (38a). Locking tabs (42a) which project outwardly from a sleeve (42) surrounding the bolt shank are deformed inwardly as the fastener is forced through an aperture (26b) in the support (26) and snap outwardly on passing therethrough. A metal compression coil spring surrounds the sleeve (42) urging the base (14) and support (26) apart preventing rattling. The spring may alternatively be of rubber and not positioned around the fastener (32). Unscrewing the bolt (40) from the sleeve (38) permits the fastener to be resecurably released. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 21/20; F16B 21/08; F16B 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/20 (2006.01); B60R 21/203 (2006.01); F16B 21/08 (2006.01); F16B 35/00 (2006.01); F16B 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/2035 (2013.01); F16B 21/086 (2013.01); F16B 35/00 (2013.01); F16B 5/065 (2013.01); Y10T 24/42 (2013.01); Y10T 24/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0754603 A1 19970122; EP 0754603 B1 20000315; DE 69607077 D1 20000420; DE 69607077 T2 20001005; JP 3033863 U 19970207; US 5624130 A 19970429

INPADOC legal status

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2007-06-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070604

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050711

2005-07-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050711

2004-07-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040720

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040707

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69607077

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-20

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AUTOLIV ASP, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990426

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970711

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT