Global Patent Index - EP 0754617 B1

EP 0754617 B1 2001-05-09 - Method for covering a ship deck, prefabricated cover unit, and method for making the unit

Title (en)

Method for covering a ship deck, prefabricated cover unit, and method for making the unit

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bedeckung eines Schiffsdecks, vorgefertigte Bedeckungseinheit und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la couverture du pont d'un bateau, unité préfabriquée de couverture et procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0754617 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96660039 A

Priority

FI 953537 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0754617A1] A method for covering a ship deck, according to which the position of the deck planks (11) with respect to each other is determined by means of transverse securing strips (12), so that the guide means (14) to be connected to the securing strips are fitted into the corresponding holes formed in the deck planks, which means that the securing strips and deck planks together form a prefabricated cover unit (10) to be fastened to the ship deck. The cover unit (10) comprises at least two deck planks (11) and at least two transverse securing strips (12) located on the underside of the deck planks, to which securing strips guide means (14) are attached fitting into the holes formed in the deck planks. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 1/00; B63B 3/68; B63B 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 3/68 (2006.01); B63B 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 3/68 (2013.01); B63B 5/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0754617 A1 19970122; EP 0754617 B1 20010509; DE 69612704 D1 20010613; DE 69612704 T2 20020131; ES 2159007 T3 20010916; FI 103776 B1 19990930; FI 103776 B 19990930; FI 953537 A0 19950721; FI 953537 A 19970122

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100720

2011-08-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100122

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69612704

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090719

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100129

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100210

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100129

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159007 T3

2001-07-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ST. DR. CAVATTONI ING. A. RAIMONDI

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612704 20010613

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2001-02-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: A/S HENNING FROEKJAER

1999-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990419

1997-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970705

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT