Global Patent Index - EP 0754788 B1

EP 0754788 B1 2002-09-25 - Method and device for avoiding mass fluctuations of fibre material

Title (en)

Method and device for avoiding mass fluctuations of fibre material

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Vermeidung von Masseschwankungen in Fasermaterial

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour éviter des fluctuations de masse d'un matériau fibreux

Publication

EP 0754788 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96111012 A

Priority

CH 212795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0754788A1] The effects of mass variations in the sliver (1) supplied to an open end spinner on the yarn (3) produced by the rotor (10) are reduced by measuring the mass variations near the rotor and controlling the associated drives. Also claimed is the appts. used in the above process. Pref. a sensor in the sliver inlet guide (5) provides a mass flow signal to a line (16) leading to an evaluation unit (24) which contains a computer or microprocessor and controls a servomotor (22) drive to the feed roller (6). The beater (7), rotor (10) and take-off roller (12) have their own common drive (13) with a control link (17) to the evaluation unit (24).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 5/38; D01G 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/70 (2006.01); D01G 23/06 (2006.01); D01H 5/38 (2006.01); D01H 13/16 (2006.01); D01H 13/26 (2006.01); D01H 13/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 23/06 (2013.01); D01H 5/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GR IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0754788 A1 19970122; EP 0754788 B1 20020925; CN 1082104 C 20020403; CN 1146505 A 19970402; DE 59609712 D1 20021031; JP H0931774 A 19970204; TR 199600596 A2 19970221; US 5775085 A 19980707

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090709

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-02-26 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *USTER TECHNOLOGIES A.G.

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080728

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080912

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080717

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2007-12-31 [REG CH PVP] PLEDGING

2007-02-15 [REG CH PVP] PLEDGING

2007-01-19 [REG FR RG] LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED

2006-07-31 [REG CH PVP] PLEDGING

2006-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-09 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

2003-11-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-06-30 [REG CH PVP] PLEDGING

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: USTER TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Free text: ZELLWEGER LUWA AG#WILSTRASSE 11#8610 USTER (CH) -TRANSFER TO- USTER TECHNOLOGIES AG#WILSTRASSE 11#8610 USTER (CH)

2002-12-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021226

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609712 20021031

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GR IT LI PT

2002-09-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981215

1997-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970722

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GR IT LI PT