Global Patent Index - EP 0754797 B1

EP 0754797 B1 2000-11-02 - Method and device for ascertaining the stop position of a toploading washing machine drum

Title (en)

Method and device for ascertaining the stop position of a toploading washing machine drum

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Positionieren der Haltestellung der Trommel einer Topladerwaschmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé de positionnement à l'arrêt d'une pièce rotative mue par un moteur universel, en particulier du tambour d'une machine à laver à chargement par le dessus, et dispositif de mise en oeuvre

Publication

EP 0754797 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401568 A

Priority

FR 9508863 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0754797A1] The rotary component (1), driven by a general purpose electric motor (2) is stopped with the aid of an electrical detector (4, 5). From the start of the motor's stop phase the current to it is cut off and it is fed with controlled current pulses which are spaced regularly and of increasing duration until the passage of the stop point is detected, then reversing the direction of rotation until the required stop position is reached. The current pulses have durations of 200 ms., 400 ms. and 600 ms. etc. in an arithmetical progression, with intervals of about 1 sec. between pulses. The detector incorporates a magnet and a flexible vane switch. Also claimed is the device used in the above process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 37/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/302 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0754797 A1 19970122; EP 0754797 B1 20001102; DE 69610799 D1 20001207; DE 69610799 T2 20010426; ES 2151643 T3 20010101; FR 2736943 A1 19970124; FR 2736943 B1 19970822

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110717

2012-11-22 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20121122

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120330

2011-11-03 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS

- Effective date: 20111021

2011-09-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20110826

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100716

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69610799

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100812

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090731

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090812

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-03-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-08-12 [REG FR ER] ERRATA LISTED IN THE FRENCH OFFICIAL JOURNAL (BOPI)

2002-03-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-03-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010330

2001-02-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-01-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151643 T3

2000-12-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69610799 20001207

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981201

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970712

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE