Global Patent Index - EP 0754817 B1

EP 0754817 B1 2001-02-28 - Under-ridge roof tile with variable open transverse area

Title (en)

Under-ridge roof tile with variable open transverse area

Title (de)

Unterfirstdachziegel mit veränderlichem freiem Querbereich

Title (fr)

Tuile sous-faîtière à pureau transversal variable

Publication

EP 0754817 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401580 A

Priority

FR 9508930 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0754817A1] The tile consists of a drain section (2) to carry away rainwater, and an adjacent curved cover section. Its upper end has a closure (3) with an upper supporting surface for the ridge tile. The closure section of the tile comprises a transverse partition (12) and an upper flat supporting surface (14) for the ridge tile, lying in the same plane as the upper surface of the cover section (1). The upper and lower surfaces of the tile sections are shaped to allow one tile to be moved transversely relative to the one beneath it, giving an adjustable amount of overlap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/30 (2013.01); E04D 2001/306 (2013.01); E04D 2001/308 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0754817 A1 19970122; EP 0754817 B1 20010228; FR 2736955 A1 19970124; FR 2736955 B1 19970926

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080730

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT PT

2001-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990817

1997-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970707

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT PT