Global Patent Index - EP 0754825 B1

EP 0754825 B1 2000-10-11 - Fencing bracket

Title (en)

Fencing bracket

Title (de)

Zaunhalter

Title (fr)

Support pour barrière

Publication

EP 0754825 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96305170 A

Priority

GB 9514717 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0754825A1] A fencing bracket (10) for securing wooden fencing panels (21) to wooden support posts (30) comprises a member (11) moulded from polypropylene having a centre section (14) and ends (12 and 13). The ends are joined to the centre section (14) by thinned areas (15,16) of substantially less thickness than the centre (14) and end sections (12,13). The thinned areas (15,16) extend transversely across the full width of the member (11) and allow the member (11) to be folded along a plurality of notional transverse lines positioned within the thinned area (15,16) to form a U-shaped bracket. The centre section (14) is nailed to the post (30) and the end sections (12,13) are nailed to the panel (21). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 17/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK FR IE IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0754825 A1 19970122; EP 0754825 B1 20001011; AT 196940 T 20001015; DE 69610594 D1 20001116; DE 69610594 T2 20010308; DK 0754825 T3 20001218; GB 2303390 A 19970219; GB 2303390 B 19990428; GB 9514717 D0 19950920; GB 9614811 D0 19960904

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090716

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-07-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090715

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-03-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-03-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *METPOST LTD

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080715

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080715

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080730

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080708

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080618

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080619

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080731

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070728

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070711

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-03-11 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-03-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2000-12-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69610594 20001116

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FR IE IT NL SE

2000-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196940 T 20001015

1998-08-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980703

1997-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970716

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FR IE IT NL SE