Global Patent Index - EP 0754908 B2

EP 0754908 B2 2001-04-18 - Method and apparatus for suspressing flame and pressure vibrations in a furnace

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for suspressing flame and pressure vibrations in a furnace

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Unterdrückung von Flammen-/Druckschwingungen bei einer Feuerung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour supprimer des vibrations par flamme et par pression dans un four

Publication

EP 0754908 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 96109647 A

Priority

  • DE 19526369 A
  • DE 19542681 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0754908A2] The flame (12) produced by the burner is directed into a combustion chamber. The flame is enveloped in a gas current possessing a faster flow rate in the flame spreading direction than the outer parts of the flame. The furnace has at least one gas outlet (9) in the form of an annular gap from which the gas flows out while enveloping the flame. The burner outlet is rotationally symmetrical. The gas may or may not contain fuel be air, be an inert gas especially nitrogen, water vapour or burnt off waste gas, a mixture of fuel and air with the fuel in a concentration inside or outside the inflammability limits.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 7/00; F23D 17/00; F23L 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/22 (2006.01); F23C 7/00 (2006.01); F23C 99/00 (2006.01); F23D 14/02 (2006.01); F23D 17/00 (2006.01); F23L 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 17/00 (2013.01); F23C 7/00 (2013.01); F23L 7/00 (2013.01); F23D 2210/00 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

DE 4231788 A1 19940324 - KOERTING AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0754908 A2 19970122; EP 0754908 A3 19980121; EP 0754908 B1 19980909; EP 0754908 B2 20010418; AT 170968 T 19980915; CN 1146543 A 19970402; CZ 9602026 A3 19970212; IN 189365 B 20030215; JP 3755934 B2 20060315; JP H09178113 A 19970711; US 5758587 A 19980602

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59600532

- Representative's name: PETERSEN, FRANK, DIPL.-ING., DE

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59600532

- Effective date: 20130101

2012-06-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59600532

- Representative's name: JANY UND PETERSEN PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2012-06-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59600532

- Representative's name: PETERSEN, FRANK, DIPL.-ING., DE

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110805

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080615

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080615

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080615

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070619

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070626

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-02-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060616

2005-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050629

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050624

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2003-06-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030617

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-07 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-08-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2001-07-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2001-06-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2001-05-16 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2001-05-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2001-04-18 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1999-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DEUTSCHER VEREIN DES GAS- UND WASSERFACHES -TECHNI

- Effective date: 19990630

1999-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BUCHNER HORST

- Effective date: 19990630

1999-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: LEUCKEL WOLFGANG

- Effective date: 19990630

1999-08-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: J. EBERSPAECHER GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 19990609

1999-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19990630

1999-06-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19990615

1999-06-15 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19990615

1999-01-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1999-01-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19981216

1998-12-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19981209

1998-10-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59600532 19981015

1998-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1998-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: COM PAT AG

1998-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1998-09-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 19980909

1998-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 170968 T 19980915

1998-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980303

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971219

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1997-02-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: DVGW DEUTSCHER VEREIN DES GAS- UND WASSERFACHES -T

1997-02-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: BUECHNER, HORST, DR.-ING.

1997-02-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: LEUCKEL, WOLFGANG, PROF. DR.-ING.

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE