Global Patent Index - EP 0754911 B1

EP 0754911 B1 2001-12-12 - Infrared rays emitter with a catalytic burner

Title (en)

Infrared rays emitter with a catalytic burner

Title (de)

Infrarotstrahler mit einem katalytischen Brenner

Title (fr)

Emetteur de rayons infrarouges à brûleur catalytique

Publication

EP 0754911 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96420083 A

Priority

US 50494695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5586877A] An infrared ray emitter with catalytic burner including a box having an opening covered by a catalytic structure and wherein a supply of combustion gas is applied adjacent the catalytic structure and a supply of recirculating gas is introduced into the box by a fan driven by a motor which extends exteriorly from a furnace in which the emitter is mounted. Brackets are provided to mount the box within a furnace in such a manner that the emitter may be angularly adjusted with respect to the support brackets.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/18; F23C 5/06; F23D 14/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/02 (2006.01); B05C 9/14 (2006.01); F23C 5/06 (2006.01); F23D 14/18 (2006.01); F23G 7/06 (2006.01); F23G 7/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 7/07 (2013.01); F23C 5/06 (2013.01); F23D 14/18 (2013.01); F26B 3/305 (2013.01); F26B 23/024 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5586877 A 19961224; AT 210798 T 20011215; DE 69617822 D1 20020124; DE 69617822 T2 20020814; EP 0754911 A2 19970122; EP 0754911 A3 19980603; EP 0754911 B1 20011212; JP 3098187 B2 20001016; JP H0929156 A 19970204

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2014-05-09 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20140404

2014-05-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SUNKISS MATHERM RADIATION, FR

- Effective date: 20140404

2014-05-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SUNKISS MATHERM RADIATION, FR

- Effective date: 20140404

2013-01-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69617822

- Effective date: 20121002

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110329

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AJC

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-07-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69617822 20020124

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210798 T 20011215

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000512

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980624

1998-07-15 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 980402 0100 A.C.I.R., SOCIETE ANONYME

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE