Global patent index - EP 0754918 B1

EP 0754918 B1 2000-09-20 - Cooking hob with a sensor arrangement for cooker heating elements.

Title (en)

Cooking hob with a sensor arrangement for cooker heating elements.

Title (de)

Kochfläche mit einer Sensoranordung für Kochstellenheizelemente.

Title (fr)

Table de cuisson avec un dispositif détecteur pour éléments chauffants des cuisinières.

Publication

EP 0754918 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96710007 A

Priority

DE 29511740 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0754918A1] The sensor device is combined with the cooking field layers made of a metallic or non-metallic material of limited thickness, with at least one monitoring sensor (4) for automatic cut-out of the electric heating source in the case of an accident. Pref. the monitoring sensor defines a surveillance conductor path enclosing the heating source which has is structured in a meandering path, a number of concentric rings, or a spiral.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 7/08; F24C 15/10; H05B 3/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/746 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29511740 U1 19951005; EP 0754918 A1 19970122; EP 0754918 B1 20000920; ES 2151648 T3 20010101

INPADOC legal status

2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040705

2005-07-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050703

2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040703

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-07-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040705

2004-07-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040703

2003-12-10 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-08-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030827

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030721

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030716

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030625

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SCHOTT GLAS

- Effective date: 20010620

2001-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2151648

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-12-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605907

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-26

2000-10-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-12-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: COOKING HOB WITH A SENSOR ARRANGEMENT FOR COOKER HEATING ELEMENTS.

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990218

1998-07-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970710

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI