Global Patent Index - EP 0754926 A3

EP 0754926 A3 2001-12-19 - Turret for a wheeled or tracked vehicle

Title (en)

Turret for a wheeled or tracked vehicle

Title (de)

Turm für ein Rad- oder Kettenfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Tourelle pour un véhicule à roues ou à chenilles

Publication

EP 0754926 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96111474 A

Priority

DE 19526664 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0754926A2] The munitions (13) are accommodated in a vertical alignment in the magazine (12) and on feed to the weapon (11) are aligned to it. The strapped munitions are wound spirally in the magazine and the strap (919) runs freely from the magazine to the weapon without the use of a guide device. A magazine can be fitted on both sides of the weapon. The magazine has a rotatable base plate (12b) with a central column (12a) and a brake device is provided for the base plate. The munition strap in its feed to the weapon is turned from its vertical alignment to one horizontal. The magazine in the outlet direction of the munition strap is inclined downwards. Near the outlet of the magazine a guide roller (14) is arranged.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 9/29; F41A 9/34; F41A 9/79

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/29 (2006.01); F41A 23/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/29 (2013.01); F41A 23/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0754926 A2 19970122; EP 0754926 A3 20011219; EP 0754926 B1 20040114; AT 257940 T 20040115; CA 2181630 A1 19970122; DE 19526664 A1 19970123; ES 2211924 T3 20040716; US 5684265 A 19971104

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050718

2006-04-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050717

2006-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050718

2005-07-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050717

2005-07-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050717

2005-01-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-09-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040928

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040729

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040723

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2211924 T3

2004-07-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040714

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040628

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040625

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040206

2004-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2004-02-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610891 P 20040219

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES GB LI NL

2004-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH

2002-02-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011124

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES GB LI NL

2001-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 41A 9/29 A, 7F 41A 9/34 B, 7F 41A 9/79 B

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES GB LI NL