Global Patent Index - EP 0754929 B1

EP 0754929 B1 2001-03-07 - Device for attaching a cartridge case to a projectile

Title (en)

Device for attaching a cartridge case to a projectile

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Befestigung einer Patronenhülse an einem Geschoss

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour fixation d'une douille à un projectile

Publication

EP 0754929 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96102062 A

Priority

CH 212395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0754929A1] For the accommodation of the cartridge (7) by the weapon a pressure piece (2) is provided, which has a cylindrical projection, which extends into a hole of a matrix (6). In the hole in the area of a mouth of the cartridge casing (10) and of the peripheral groove an elastic ring (14) is arranged. A face surface of the elastic ring faces the face surface of the cylindrical projection and the second face surface locates via a sealing disc (15) on two slides (16) which are positioned vertically to the longitudinal axis of the cartridge in the matrix. The elastic ring is made of Vulkolan (RTM) of the Adipren (RTM) type.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 5/067 (2006.01); F42B 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 33/001 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49913 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49934 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0754929 A1 19970122; EP 0754929 B1 20010307; CA 2176548 A1 19970118; CH 691556 A5 20010815; DE 59606536 D1 20010412; JP H0933196 A 19970207; NO 960665 A 19970120; NO 960665 D0 19960220; SG 55216 A1 19981221; US 5763809 A 19980609

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606536

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: OERLIKON-CONTRAVES PYROTEC A.G.

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-08-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606536 20010412

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-03-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-03-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-03-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-03-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010307

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981221

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970208

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL