Global Patent Index - EP 0754943 B1

EP 0754943 B1 2000-04-12 - Yarn measuring device

Title (en)

Yarn measuring device

Title (de)

Garnmessgerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mesure d'un fil

Publication

EP 0754943 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95115049 A

Priority

JP 20760595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0754943A2] A device is provided whereby, when measuring yarn which has hairs, it is possible to detect data for the hairy part (7) and data for the core part (6) individually. The yarn measuring device is provided with means (21, 24, 25) for forming a Fourier transformation pattern, including a yarn core part pattern (10) and a surface projection pattern (11), on a spectrum plane (26), by performing a Fourier transformation on diffracted laser light which has intersected and passed through traveling yarn; a first light detecting means (28) which receives only one of the core part pattern (10) and the surface projection pattern (11); and a second light detecting means (32) which receives only the other pattern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 21/89; G01N 21/88; G01N 33/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/10 (2006.01); D01H 13/22 (2006.01); D06H 3/08 (2006.01); G01N 21/89 (2006.01); G01N 21/892 (2006.01); G01N 21/956 (2006.01); G01N 33/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/365 (2013.01); G01N 21/8915 (2013.01); G01N 21/95623 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0754943 A2 19970122; EP 0754943 A3 19980318; EP 0754943 B1 20000412; CN 1065626 C 20010509; CN 1141428 A 19970129; DE 69516276 D1 20000518; DE 69516276 T2 20001214; JP 3611140 B2 20050119; JP H0933224 A 19970207; US 5615014 A 19970325

INPADOC legal status


2015-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-09-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69516276

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100925

2011-07-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100925

2011-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KEISOKKI KOGYO CO. LTD

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-07-03 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-31 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ZELLWEGER LUWA AG, USTER

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-09-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-06-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PORTA CHECCACCI & ASSOCIATI S.P.A.

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516276 20000518

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB IT LI

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991018

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980509

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB IT LI

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB IT LI