Global Patent Index - EP 0755096 B1

EP 0755096 B1 2000-03-22 - A female terminal metal fittings and a preparing method thereof

Title (en)

A female terminal metal fittings and a preparing method thereof

Title (de)

Metallische Kontaktbuchse und Verfahren zur Herstellung

Title (fr)

Borne métallique femelle et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0755096 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96111536 A

Priority

JP 20526695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0755096A1] A female terminal has a front portion adapted to receive a male terminal corresponding thereto, a rear portion adapted to receive and make electrical contact with an electric cable comprising a conductive core surrounded by an insulative sheath, and at least one resilient contact in said front portion into which said male terminal is adapted to be inserted, said resilient contact having an extremity comprising a first and a second main surface located opposite to each other, said first main surface being formed as an even plane and said second main surface being formed as a plane chamfered in the direction toward said first main surface for contacting a bottom plate of said female terminal, thereby forming a sliding contact at a contact point with said bottom plate. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/115

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 13/115 (2006.01); H01R 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/113 (2013.01); H01R 43/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0755096 A1 19970122; EP 0755096 B1 20000322; CN 1146645 A 19970402; DE 69607252 D1 20000427; DE 69607252 T2 20000713; JP H0935795 A 19970207

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69607252

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120711

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-03-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-07-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030717

2002-07-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020717

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607252 20000427

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-06-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980424

1997-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970228

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB