Global patent index - EP 0755206 B1

EP 0755206 B1 2000-02-02 - FASTENER HAVING HIGH SILENCING PROPERTY

Title (en)

FASTENER HAVING HIGH SILENCING PROPERTY

Title (de)

VERSCHLUSS MIT EINER SCHALLDÄMPFENDEN EIGENSCHAFT

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE FIXATION A POUVOIR D'INSONORISATION ELEVE

Publication

EP 0755206 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95915585 A

Priority

  • JP 7334094 A
  • US 9504265 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9527418A2] The present invention provides a fastener which does not generate noise when it is engaged to an article and vibration is applied thereto. The fastener comprises a base portion, a stem portion implanted and interconnected to the base portion in a spaced-apart relationship by a predetermined distance from the base portion, and a head portion interconnected to the distal end of the base portion. At least a part of the stem portion or the head portion comprises (1) a polyphase polymer material having a first polymer resin and a second polymer resin, or (2) a polymer resin that increases the flexural modulus of the fastener. Since the fastener does not generate noise during vibration, it is useful as a fastener particularly for fitting automobile components together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 18/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 18/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 18/0069 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9527418 A2 19951019; WO 9527418 A3 19951130; CA 2186610 A1 19951013; CN 1104216 C 20030402; CN 1145579 A 19970319; DE 69514917 D1 20000309; DE 69514917 T2 20001005; EP 0755206 A1 19970129; EP 0755206 B1 20000202; MX 9604584 A 19971129

INPADOC legal status

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090406

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090406

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080602

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-04-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060424

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69514917

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-09

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

1997-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970605

1997-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961105

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT