Global patent index - EP 0755222 A4

EP 0755222 A4 2000-03-08 - MICROFLUIDIZATION OF CALCIUM/OXYANION-CONTAINING PARTICLES

Title (en)

MICROFLUIDIZATION OF CALCIUM/OXYANION-CONTAINING PARTICLES

Title (de)

MIKROFLUIDISIERUNG VON CALCIUM-OXYANION ENTHALTENDEN PARTIKELN

Title (fr)

MICROFLUIDISATION DE PARTICULES CONTENANT DU CALCIUM ET UN OXYANION

Publication

EP 0755222 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 94915769 A

Priority

US 9403276 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 5/055; A61K 33/32; A61K 33/42; A61K 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 49/00 (2006.01); A61B 5/055 (2006.01); A61K 33/32 (2006.01); A61K 33/42 (2006.01); A61K 49/04 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A61K (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

AU 6766494 A 19951030; EP 0755222 A1 19970129; EP 0755222 A4 20000308; FI 964057 A0 19961010; JP H09511520 A 19971118; NO 964317 D0 19961010

INPADOC legal status

2001-05-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20010320

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MALLINCKRODT INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-03-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61B 5/055 A, 7A 61K 33/32 B, 7A 61K 33/42 B, 7A 61K 49/00 B

1997-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961023

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE