Global Patent Index - EP 0755473 B1

EP 0755473 B1 2000-08-30 - DOWEL STRIP FOR BENT-UP BARS

Title (en)

DOWEL STRIP FOR BENT-UP BARS

Title (de)

DÜBELLEISTE FÜR SCHUBBEWEHRUNGEN

Title (fr)

BANDE A GOUJONS POUR BARRES RELEVEES

Publication

EP 0755473 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95911320 A

Priority

  • DE 4412598 A
  • EP 9500891 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4412598A1] A dowel strip for bent-up bars in reinforced concrete beams or panels consists of a strip (5) and a plurality of dowels (6) perpendicularly welded to the strip (5) and spaced apart. Each dowel (6) has a widened head (8). The dowel shank (7) is smooth and cylindrical at both its end sections (7a, 7c). The central section (7b) between them is ribbed (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/02; E04B 5/43; E04C 5/03; E04C 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/02 (2006.01); E04C 5/03 (2006.01); E04C 5/06 (2006.01); E04C 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/0645 (2013.01); E04C 5/02 (2013.01); E04C 5/03 (2013.01); E04C 5/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4412598 A1 19951019; AT 195990 T 20000915; CA 2187797 A1 19951026; DK 0755473 T3 20010122; EP 0755473 A1 19970129; EP 0755473 B1 20000830; ES 2150557 T3 20001201; GR 3034986 T3 20010228; JP H09512068 A 19971202; NO 300786 B1 19970721; NO 964340 A 19961213; NO 964340 D0 19961011; US 5867960 A 19990209; WO 9528534 A1 19951026

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060310

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060310

2006-03-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060310

2005-03-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-03-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050323

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-03-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050322

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-03-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050321

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-03-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-02-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-04-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030203

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-12-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-19 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2001-11-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2001-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: LEONHARDT ANDRA UND PARTNER BERATENDE INGENIEURE

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DEHA ANKERSYSTEME G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010312

2001-03-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010311

2001-03-10 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010310

2001-03-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010310

2001-01-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-01-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001214

2000-12-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150557 T3

2000-11-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-10-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508686 20001005

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195990 T 20000915

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEONHARDT, ANDRAE UND PARTNER BERATENDE INGENIEURE

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEHA ANKERSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZELLNER, WILHELM, DIPL.-ING.

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOEHLER, BERNHARD

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAUL, REINER

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SEIFRIED, GERHARD

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SVENSSON, HOLGER

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEHA ANKERSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANDRAE, HANS-PETER, DR.-ING.

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990813

1997-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960822

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE