Global Patent Index - EP 0755502 B1

EP 0755502 B1 2001-03-21 - PRACTICE MINE, PROGRAMMING DEVICE THEREFOR, AND SIMULATION DEVICE USING SAID MINE

Title (en)

PRACTICE MINE, PROGRAMMING DEVICE THEREFOR, AND SIMULATION DEVICE USING SAID MINE

Title (de)

ÜBUNGSMINE, PROGRAMMIERVORRICHTUNG UND SIMULATIONSGERÄT FÜR EINE SOLCHE MINE

Title (fr)

MINE D'EXERCICE, DISPOSITIF DE PROGRAMMATION ET DISPOSITIF DE SIMULATION METTANT EN OEUVRE UNE TELLE MINE

Publication

EP 0755502 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96902318 A

Priority

  • FR 9600165 W
  • FR 9501580 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5801322A] PCT No. PCT/FR96/00165 Sec. 371 Date Sep. 9, 1996 Sec. 102(e) Date Sep. 9, 1996 PCT Filed Jan. 31, 1996 PCT Pub. No. WO96/24818 PCT Pub. Date Aug. 15, 1996The invention relates to an exercise mine system for training in mine detection. The invention including a passive oscillating circuit tuned to a certain frequency. This circuit being designed to be detected by another active oscillating circuit carried by an individual or vehicle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 8/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 8/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 8/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5801322 A 19980901; AT 199977 T 20010415; DE 69612149 D1 20010426; DE 69612149 T2 20010719; EP 0755502 A1 19970129; EP 0755502 B1 20010321; ES 2155183 T3 20010501; FR 2730557 A1 19960814; FR 2730557 B1 19970411; NO 964288 A 19961009; NO 964288 D0 19961009; WO 9624818 A1 19960815

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080131

2006-12-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-12-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-01-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-09-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-09-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GIAT INDUSTRIES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-02-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-06-22 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-06-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BOTTI & FERRARI S.R.L.

2001-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155183 T3

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612149 20010426

2001-04-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB GR IT LI NL SE

2001-03-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199977 T 20010415

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990318

1997-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960928

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB GR IT LI NL SE